This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2022 at 17:59:16 (UTC).

SOHAL, MANVIR VS SANDEL, ARVIND

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 SOHAL, MANVIR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SANDEL, ARVIND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1000

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SOHAL MANVIR

Respondent

SANDEL ARVIND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

5/31/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Notice - Case Assignment

5/31/2022: Notice - Case Assignment

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/31/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

5/31/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Summons

5/31/2022: Summons

Declaration - UCCJEA

5/31/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA

Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service)

6/15/2022: Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service)

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/28/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - UCCJEA

6/28/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

6/28/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Proof of Service - Mail - Response-marriage/Domestic Partnership

7/1/2022: Proof of Service - Mail - Response-marriage/Domestic Partnership

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Response-marriage/Domestic Partnership ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE