*******0653
01/12/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Debt Collection
Los Angeles, California
SOFI LENDING CORP.
RODRIGUEZ LUPE
ROHAN RALUCA
1/12/2023: Complaint
1/12/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet
1/12/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
1/12/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
1/12/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
1/12/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
1/12/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
1/25/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference
2/3/2023: Proof of Personal Service
Hearing07/11/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: SoFi Lending Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Lupe Rodriguez (Defendant); Service Date: 01/21/2023; Service Cost: 68.00; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/11/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: SoFi Lending Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Lupe Rodriguez (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SoFi Lending Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Lupe Rodriguez (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SoFi Lending Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Lupe Rodriguez (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Lia Martin in Department 16 Stanley Mosk Courthouse
[-] Read Less