This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 00:50:44 (UTC).

SOFI LENDING CORP. VS ARTUR SARGSYAN

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 SOFI LENDING CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARTUR SARGSYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0800

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOFI LENDING CORP.

Defendant

SARGSYAN ARTUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JYOO JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/10/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/10/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Service - No Service

6/29/2021: Proof of Service - No Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/7/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • Hearing11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • Hearing10/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by Sofi Lending Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sofi Lending Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sofi Lending Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sofi Lending Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOFI LENDING CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JYOO JOSEPH