This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 02:33:15 (UTC).

SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC VS BENBAROUKH LLC

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BENBAROUKH LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1347

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC

Defendant

BENBAROUKH LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARIKH SAGAR P.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/4/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Application - APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SERVE SECRETARY OF STATE PURSUANT TO CA CORP CODE 17701.16(C)

10/12/2021: Application - APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SERVE SECRETARY OF STATE PURSUANT TO CA CORP CODE 17701.16(C)

Notice - NOTICE OF RECORDED LIS PENDENS

10/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RECORDED LIS PENDENS

Order - ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SERVE SECRETARY OF STATE PURSUANT TO CA CORP 17701.16(C)

10/20/2021: Order - ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SERVE SECRETARY OF STATE PURSUANT TO CA CORP 17701.16(C)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • Hearing02/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF RECORDED LIS PENDENS); Filed by SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketOrder (GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SERVE SECRETARY OF STATE PURSUANT TO CA Corp 17701.16(c)); Filed by SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketApplication (FOR ORDER TO SERVE SECRETARY OF STATE PURSUANT TO CA Corp Code 17701.16(c)); Filed by SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BENBAROUKH LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant