This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/18/2022 at 08:22:19 (UTC).

SNODGRASS, JULIE VS KATERJIAN, HAROUT

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 SNODGRASS, JULIE filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against KATERJIAN, HAROUT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTELLA, TIMOTHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1243

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARTELLA, TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Respondent

SNODGRASS JULIE

Respondents and Appellants

KATERJIAN HAROUT

SNODGRASS JULIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

KNAPP CANAAN JOSHUA

VALENZUELA ALEJANDRO MANUEL

Respondent and Appellant Attorney

VALENZUELA ALEJANDRO MANUEL

 

Court Documents

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

11/21/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003 010 103

11/18/2022: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003 010 103

Minute Order

11/7/2022: Minute Order

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

11/10/2022: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - Appeal - Notice of Appeal Cross Appeal Filed

11/7/2022: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - Appeal - Notice of Appeal Cross Appeal Filed

Minute Order

11/4/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/4/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

11/4/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

10/31/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Objection - Objections to Respondent's Reply Evidence

10/31/2022: Objection - Objections to Respondent's Reply Evidence

Objection - Objection

10/28/2022: Objection - Objection

Reply - Reply

10/28/2022: Reply - Reply

Declaration - Declaration of Melinda Helscher

10/24/2022: Declaration - Declaration of Melinda Helscher

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

10/24/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Objection - Objections to Respondent's Evidence

10/24/2022: Objection - Objections to Respondent's Evidence

Declaration - Declaration of Julie Snodgrass

10/24/2022: Declaration - Declaration of Julie Snodgrass

Opposition - Opposition

10/24/2022: Opposition - Opposition

Declaration - Declaration of Ashley Beckford

10/24/2022: Declaration - Declaration of Ashley Beckford

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2023
  • Hearing11/07/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department S at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Restraining Order Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003 010 103 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department S, Martella, Timothy, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed (Appeal - Notice of Appeal Cross Appeal Filed ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketMotion (Respondent's notice of special motion to strike and special motion to strike petition pursuant to CCP section 425.16; memorandum of points and aurthorities; declaration of respondent in support thereof ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment (violence); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KNAPP CANAAN JOSHUA