Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2021 at 08:52:20 (UTC).

SMITH, SHEILA ANN VS THOMPSON, MONICA LYNN

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 SMITH, SHEILA ANN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against THOMPSON, MONICA LYNN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WARREN, JEANMARIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6139

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WARREN, JEANMARIE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SMITH SHEILA ANN

Respondent

THOMPSON MONICA LYNN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

11/18/2020: Proof of Service

Minute Order

12/2/2020: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

12/2/2020: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

11/9/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

11/9/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

11/9/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

11/9/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

11/9/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 13, Warren, Jeanmarie, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less