This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2020 at 06:35:59 (UTC).

SMITH, MICHAEL VS LAZARO, RANDOLPH

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 SMITH, MICHAEL filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against LAZARO, RANDOLPH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PACHECO, RANDALL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0242

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PACHECO, RANDALL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SMITH MICHAEL

Respondent

LAZARO RANDOLPH

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

2/11/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/11/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

2/11/2020: Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

2/11/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

2/11/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Request - Accomodations by Persons with Disabilities adn Response

2/19/2020: Request - Accomodations by Persons with Disabilities adn Response

Request - Accomodations by Persons with Disabilities adn Response

2/19/2020: Request - Accomodations by Persons with Disabilities adn Response

Proof of Service

2/25/2020: Proof of Service

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

3/3/2020: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Minute Order

3/3/2020: Minute Order

Proof of Service

3/11/2020: Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S16, Pacheco, Randall, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketRequest (Accomodations by Persons with Disabilities adn Response ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketPetition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.