Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2021 at 06:20:17 (UTC).

SMITH-JOHNSON, BRENDA REGINA - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 SMITH-JOHNSON, BRENDA REGINA - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOGDANOFF, LEE R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3265

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOGDANOFF, LEE R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHNSON MARLIN

Decedent

SMITH-JOHNSON BRENDA REGINA

Interested Party

LEWELLYN LARRY D

Not Classified By Court

KRAAKEVIK PATTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Interested Party Attorney

LEWELLYN LARRY DARRYL

 

Court Documents

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

5/18/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Supplement - OF PETITIONER MARLIN JOHNSON TO PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

5/6/2021: Supplement - OF PETITIONER MARLIN JOHNSON TO PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

Minute Order

5/12/2021: Minute Order

Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140) - ORDER FOR PROBATE

5/13/2021: Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140) - ORDER FOR PROBATE

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

4/29/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

4/29/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

4/6/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • Hearing10/14/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) filed on April 6, 2021 by Marlin Johnson, Larry Darryl Lewellyn. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-Before Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketSupplement (OF PETITIONER MARLIN JOHNSON TO PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWELLYN LARRY DARRYL