This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 04:58:09 (UTC).

SMART PATIO PLUS INC. VS MCFG LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 SMART PATIO PLUS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MCFG LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GLORIA WHITE-BROWN and PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0630

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMART PATIO PLUS INC.

Defendants

MCFG LLC

CHING KEVIN

CHIANG JUSTIN

BURKS CHRISTOPHER

LEE & ASSOCIATES COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC.-CITY OF INDUSTRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEAGLIA RICHARD

Defendant Attorneys

TAITELMAN MICHAEL A.

CARNEY TERENCE P

KRESHEK BRADLEY HOWARD

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

2/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

2/18/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 11/03/2020

11/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 11/03/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

11/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/19/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

10/29/2020: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Answer

11/2/2020: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/3/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/19/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/19/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/19/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/19/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/29/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/29/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/29/2020: Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • Hearing05/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: why cases should not be related

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Hearing05/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Hearing04/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department D; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer (Portions of Complaint filed om behalf of MCFG, LLC and Christopher Burks) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketOpposition (Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint); Filed by Smart Patio Plus Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Smart Patio Plus Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MCFG LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Smart Patio Plus Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Smart Patio Plus Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Smart Patio Plus Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Smart Patio Plus Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Smart Patio Plus Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Smart Patio Plus Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Smart Patio Plus Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE & ASSOCIATES COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC.-CITY OF INDUSTRY is a litigant