This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2020 at 01:05:44 (UTC).

SM 10000 PROPERTY, LLC VS URBANE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 SM 10000 PROPERTY, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against URBANE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0450

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SM 10000 PROPERTY LLC

Defendants

LEE SHAYNA

URBANE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPARKS VALERIE A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE]

3/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE]

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/18/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (URBANE, LLC)

3/24/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (URBANE, LLC)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

3/24/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (SHAYNA LEE)

3/24/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (SHAYNA LEE)

Request for Dismissal

8/12/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail

8/12/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by SM 10000 Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SM 10000 Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Shayna Lee)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Urbane, LLC)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Civil Case Cover Sheet, Complaint, Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SM 10000 Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SM 10000 Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SM 10000 Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SM 10000 PROPERTY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sparks, Valerie