This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2022 at 12:13:13 (UTC).

SM 10000 PROPERTY LLC VS MICHELLE MACCIO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 SM 10000 PROPERTY LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHELLE MACCIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0409

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SM 10000 PROPERTY LLC

Defendants

BUENO CHERRYL

MACCIO MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OLSEN THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/23/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/23/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/15/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • Hearing09/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 207 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by SM 10000 Property LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SM 10000 Property LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SM 10000 Property LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SM 10000 Property LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SM 10000 Property LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SM 10000 PROPERTY LLC is a litigant