This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2022 at 21:30:31 (UTC).

SM 10000 PROPERTY LLC VS FLORA TELECOM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 SM 10000 PROPERTY LLC filed an Other lawsuit against FLORA TELECOM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0338

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SM 10000 PROPERTY LLC

Defendants

FERDOUS JANNUTAL

ISLAM MUSTAFA RAFIQUIL

TELECOM FLORA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OLSEN THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (FLORA TELECOM)

3/11/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (FLORA TELECOM)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

3/11/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (JANNUTAL FERDOUS)

3/11/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (JANNUTAL FERDOUS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (MUSTAFA RAFIQUIL ISLAM)

3/11/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (MUSTAFA RAFIQUIL ISLAM)

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/10/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

3/9/2022: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

3/9/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/9/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • Hearing09/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Jannutal Ferdous)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Mustafa Rafiquil Islam)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Flora Telecom)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SM 10000 Property LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by SM 10000 Property LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SM 10000 Property LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SM 10000 Property LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SM 10000 PROPERTY LLC is a litigant