This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 19:08:06 (UTC).

SKY PROPERTIES INC VS VALOR LLP ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/06/2017 SKY PROPERTIES INC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against VALOR LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7584

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

SKY PROPERTIES INC

Respondents and Defendants

VALOR LLP

KERMANI-NEJAD RAMIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GENTINO ROBERT ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MAURO MARCELO E. DI

VALOR LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

8/9/2018: Minute Order -

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

5/13/2020: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

5/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 05/15/2020

5/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 05/15/2020

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL, CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD, AND ENTER JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF ROBERT GENTINO

8/20/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL, CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD, AND ENTER JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF ROBERT GENTINO

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/20/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION

8/26/2020: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION

Judgment - JUDGMENT ARBITRATION AWARD

9/3/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT ARBITRATION AWARD

Order to Set Aside / Vacate - ORDER TO SET ASIDE / VACATE DISMISSAL

9/3/2020: Order to Set Aside / Vacate - ORDER TO SET ASIDE / VACATE DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DISMISSAL (CCP 473))

9/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DISMISSAL (CCP 473))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DISMISSAL (CCP 473)) OF 09/03/2020

9/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DISMISSAL (CCP 473)) OF 09/03/2020

Motion for Reconsideration - MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND VACATE 09/09/2020 ORDER OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SECTION 473 RELIEF FROM THIS ORDER

9/21/2020: Motion for Reconsideration - MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND VACATE 09/09/2020 ORDER OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SECTION 473 RELIEF FROM THIS ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

9/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND VACATE SEPTEMBER 3, 2020 ORDER OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SECTION 473 RELIEF FROM THIS ORDER

10/13/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND VACATE SEPTEMBER 3, 2020 ORDER OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SECTION 473 RELIEF FROM THIS ORDER

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND VACATE SEPTEMBER 3, 2020 ORDER OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SECTION 473 RELIEF FROM THIS ORDER

10/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND VACATE SEPTEMBER 3, 2020 ORDER OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SECTION 473 RELIEF FROM THIS ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER

11/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER

Reply - REPLY SUPPORTING MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND VACATE SEPTEMBER 9, 2020 ORDER OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SECTION 473 RELIEF FROM THIS ORDER; DECLARATION OF ROBERT GENTINO

2/3/2021: Reply - REPLY SUPPORTING MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND VACATE SEPTEMBER 9, 2020 ORDER OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SECTION 473 RELIEF FROM THIS ORDER; DECLARATION OF ROBERT GENTINO

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION) OF 02/10/2021

2/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION) OF 02/10/2021

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by Sky Properties, Inc (Appellant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by Sky Properties, Inc (Appellant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration) of 02/10/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketJudgment (JUDGMENT By Court); Filed by Valor LLP (Defendant); Ramin Kermani-Nejad (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketReply (SUPPORTING MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND VACATE SEPTEMBER 9, 2020 ORDER OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SECTION 473 RELIEF FROM THIS ORDER; DECLARATION OF ROBERT GENTINO); Filed by Sky Properties, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Sky Properties, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketREJECTION OF AWARD AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL AFTER ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sky Properties, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7584    Hearing Date: September 03, 2020    Dept: 40

MOVING PARTY: Defendants Valor LLP and

Ramin Kermani-Nejad

OPPOSITION: Plaintiff Sky Properties, Inc.

This matter arises from a fee dispute between Defendants Valor LLP and Ramin Kermani-Nejad (collectively, “Defendants”) and Plaintiff Sky Properties, Inc. (“Plaintiff”). Defendants represented Plaintiff in an unlawful detainer action and there was a dispute about the fees owed for Defendants’ services. On May 12, 2017, a Los Angeles County Bar Association (“LACBA”) arbitrator awarded Defendants $27,994.73 in fees and costs, plus annual interest of ten percent.

On July 6, 2017, Plaintiff filed a declaratory relief action opposing the arbitration award. On October 12, 2017, the parties stipulated to arbitration.

On August 9, 2018, the Court own its own motion dismissed the case, reserving jurisdiction to enter judgment on an arbitration award.

Defendants filed the instant motion requesting that judgment be entered in their favor for the sum of $27,994.73, plus the annual interest of ten percent on the awarded amount commencing July 7, 2017.

A petition to confirm a binding arbitration shall name as respondents all parties to the arbitration and may name any other parties to be bound by the award. (CCP ; 1285.) The petition shall (1) set forth the substance of or have attached a copy of the agreement to arbitrate unless petitioner denies the existence of such an agreement; (2) set forth the name(s) of the arbitrator(s); and (3) set forth or have attached a copy of the award and written opinion of the arbitrator. (CCP ; 1285.4(a)-(c).)

The petition to confirm must be served and filed no later than four years after the date of service of a signed copy of the award on the petitioner (CCP ; 1288.) but may not be served and filed until at least 10 days after service of the signed copy of the award upon the petitioner. (CCP ; 1288.4.)

Defendants argue that Plaintiff has failed to prosecute or arbitrate the matter. Defendants state that they served multiple demands on Plaintiff to commence arbitration, which Plaintiff ignored.

Plaintiff states that Defendants did not inform them of the order compelling arbitration till March 2018. Plaintiff states that arbitration commenced on May 16, 2018. On that day, Plaintiff served a demand for arbitration before ADR services. (Opp’n., Ex. A.) A subsequent email from Defendants indicates that they received the demand and were discussing their preferred arbitrators. (Opp’n., Ex. B.)

It appears that arbitration has not taken place and that nothing has happened in the last two years. Based on the delay, the Court is inclined to grant the motion and confirm LACBA’s award.

The motion has been filed within four years after the date of service of a signed copy of the award. A copy of the arbitration agreement is provided. (Mtn., Ex. A.) A copy of the arbitration award is attached to the motion which contains the name of the arbitrator. (Mtn., Ex. B.)

Conclusion: Defendants’ Motion to Confirm the Arbitration Award is GRANTED.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Valor LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where SKY PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant