This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2018 at 05:32:33 (UTC).

SKY ISLAND, INC. VS ALBERT WILLIAMS, JR.

Case Summary

On 07/05/2017 SKY ISLAND, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALBERT WILLIAMS, JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7778

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SKY ISLAND INC.

Defendants

L.B.C.C. GROUP INC.

WILLIAM JR. ALBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIKHAYLOVA OLESYA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg. (RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT;) - OSC held & continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default (AS TO: ALBERT WILLIAMS AND L.B.C.C., INC REJECTED-AN AGENT OF SERVICE NEEDS TO BE LISTED ON BEHALF OF THE ORGANIZATION. REJECTION NOTICE SENT OUT ON 06/29/18.); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg. (RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT;) - OSC held & continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default (AS TO: ALBERT WILLIAMS JR. AND LBCC., INC-RECEIVED REJECTED-#4 IS INCOMPLETE. REJECTION LETTER MAILED OUT ON 06/12/18. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg. (RE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT;) - OSC held & continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default (AS TO: L.B.C.C. GROUP, INC.- RECEIVED AND REJECTED. #4 IS INCOMPLETE, #5BOX IS NOT CHECKED, #6B2 AN AGENT OF SERVICE WITH AN ADDRESS NEEDS TO BE LISTED. REJECTION LTR. SENT ON 04/12/18.); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default (AS TO: ALBERT WILLIAMS JR. AND REJECTED. #4 IS INCOMPLETE. REJECTION LETTER MAILED OUT ON 04/12/18. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com (PARTY SERVED: ALBERT WILLIAMS JR. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com (PARTY SERVED: L.B.C.C.M GROUP. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding; Conference-Case Management (AND POS) - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Status conference is held & cont.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SKY ISLAND INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIKHAYLOVA OLESYA