Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2018 at 06:45:13 (UTC).

SKULL BASE MEDICAL GROUP INC VS VICKY CARTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 SKULL BASE MEDICAL GROUP INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VICKY CARTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3921

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SKULL BASE MEDICAL GROUP INC.

SKULL BASE INSTITUTE

Defendants and Respondents

BOWEN VICKY

BOWEN VICKY ANN

CARTER VICKY

CARTER DANNY WAYNE

CARTER VICKY ANN

CARTER DANNY W

DOES 1 TO 10

CARTER DANNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ZEE TAPPAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/2/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

7/2/2018: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT

7/2/2018: JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

7/2/2018: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

Minute Order

7/2/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/8/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

5/17/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/12/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/19/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

3/27/2018: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

2/14/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

2/14/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY, KIMBERLY BARRIENTOS, ESQ., PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC., SECTION 1033; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Statement of the Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Skull Base Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Skull Base Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Skull Base Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SKULL BASE MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEE LAW GROUP, P.C. - TAPPAN ZEE