This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 10:12:12 (UTC).

SKETCH TEXTILE INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS TIME LESS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 SKETCH TEXTILE INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TIME LESS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3067

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SKETCH TEXTILE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

LEE YONG IL

TIME LESS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA LIBIAN

LEE HEA SOOK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MYUNG S. CALVIN

MYUNG S CALVIN

KIM JAMIE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

11/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

10/19/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

8/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/08/2021

4/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/08/2021

Declaration - DECLARATION RE FAILURE TO APPEAR

5/7/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION RE FAILURE TO APPEAR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

5/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE;)

2/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE;) OF 02/03/2021

2/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE;) OF 02/03/2021

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

1/13/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

1/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/13/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

1/13/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/29/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/3/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/25/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/25/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/25/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by SKETCH TEXTILE INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute and for Failure of Plaintiff to Appear on the Hearing date of 4/8/2021) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by SKETCH TEXTILE INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by SKETCH TEXTILE INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SKETCH TEXTILE INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SKETCH TEXTILE INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SKETCH TEXTILE INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SKETCH TEXTILE INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SKETCH TEXTILE INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SKETCH TEXTILE INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIME LESS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA LIBIAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MYUNG S. CALVIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JAMIE