This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2021 at 07:29:24 (UTC).

SKECHERS USA, INC. VS HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 SKECHERS USA, INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3140

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SKECHERS USA INC.

Defendant

HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHACK DAVID P.

O'HANLON MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/10/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

12/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

3/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT

3/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

2/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

2/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SKECHERS USA, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT); Filed by SKECHERS USA, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by SKECHERS USA, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT); Filed by SKECHERS USA, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by SKECHERS USA, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SKECHERS USA, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SKECHERS USA, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SKECHERS USA, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SKECHERS USA, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SKECHERS USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHACK DAVID P.