This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2020 at 01:47:11 (UTC).

SJO INVESTMENTS, LLC VS SERGIO ROJAS

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 SJO INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SERGIO ROJAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5204

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SJO INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

ROJAS SERGIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENOCHS JON

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/18/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Lis Pendens

12/18/2019: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/13/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/13/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/5/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal

2/5/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SJO Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by SJO Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by SJO Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SJO Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SJO Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SJO Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SJO INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENOCHS JON