This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 18:39:04 (UTC).

SIYU CHEN VS DE WELL GROUP, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 SIYU CHEN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DE WELL GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES, DAVID J. COWAN and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9579

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

DAVID J. COWAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHEN SIYU

Defendant

DE WELL GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAYYALI RAMI MUSA

Defendant Attorney

GOLDSTEIN CHARLES H

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/15/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAMI KAYYALI IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF REPRESENTATIVE PORTION OF PAGA AND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE PUTATIVE CLASS

6/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAMI KAYYALI IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF REPRESENTATIVE PORTION OF PAGA AND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE PUTATIVE CLASS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/17/2021

6/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/17/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 06/28/2021, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE NOTICE - FIRST AM

6/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 06/28/2021, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE NOTICE - FIRST AM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

6/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND T...) OF 07/14/2021

7/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND T...) OF 07/14/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND T...)

7/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND T...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/20/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPUATION FOR THE COURT TO STAY THIS MATTER PENDING THE DECISION IN ARBITRATION

7/20/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPUATION FOR THE COURT TO STAY THIS MATTER PENDING THE DECISION IN ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/11/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

5/11/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Notice of Appearance

3/23/2021: Notice of Appearance

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/23/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Siyu Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipuation for the Court to Stay This Matter Pending The Decision in Arbitration); Filed by De Well Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by De Well Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:56 AM in Department F; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Setting Case for Case Management Conference and T...) of 07/14/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Setting Case for Case Management Conference and T...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:16 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Siyu Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Docketat 10:12 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketOrder (Authorizing Electronic Service (Case Anywhere)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/03/2021, Initial Status Conference Order and Order Authorizing Electronic Service (Case Anywhere)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Siyu Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Siyu Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DE WELL GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDSTEIN CHARLES