This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/28/2021 at 04:41:20 (UTC).

SIYING YUAN, ET AL. VS AHMC HEALTHCARE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 SIYING YUAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against AHMC HEALTHCARE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3572

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIYING YUAN BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM BAIPING YUAN

YUAN BAIPING INDIVIDUALLY

YUAN BAIPING

Defendants

AHMC HEALTHCARE

FOONG NICOLAI M.D.

AHMC HEALTHCARE DBA SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GAMBARDELLA STEVEN

GAMBARDELLA STEVEN CARMINE ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

LAW YUK K.

PACKER ROBERT B.

LAW YUK KWONG ESQ.

PACKER ROBERT BRUCE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Motion for Summary Judgment

6/25/2021: Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AHMC SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, LPS MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ISSUE AND EVIDENCE SANCTIONS

7/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AHMC SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, LPS MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ISSUE AND EVIDENCE SANCTIONS

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS LATE OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS FOR VIOLATION OF DISCOVERY ORDERS AND TERMINTATING SANCTIONS; CCP 473 DECLARATION BY COUNSEL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTH

7/27/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS LATE OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS FOR VIOLATION OF DISCOVERY ORDERS AND TERMINTATING SANCTIONS; CCP 473 DECLARATION BY COUNSEL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTH

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OF PLAINTIFF TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

4/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OF PLAINTIFF TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OF PLAINTIFF TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

4/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OF PLAINTIFF TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVE...)

4/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVE...)

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

11/25/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NICOLAI FOONG, M.D.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES

12/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NICOLAI FOONG, M.D.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVE...)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVE...)

Notice of Ruling

12/10/2020: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

7/8/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/25/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

2/25/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

2/25/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

1/7/2020: Answer

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

10/28/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/1/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Siying Yuan, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Baiping Yuan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Siying Yuan, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Baiping Yuan (Plaintiff); Baiping Yuan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketOpposition (PLAINTIFFS? LATE OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS FOR VIOLATION OF DISCOVERY ORDERS AND TERMINTATING SANCTIONS; CCP 473 DECLARATION BY COUNSEL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Siying Yuan, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Baiping Yuan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Non-receipt of Opposition to Defendant Ahmc San Gabriel Valley Medical Center, Lps Motion for Terminating Sanctions, or in the Alternative, for Issue and Evidence Sanctions); Filed by AHMC San GAbriel Valley Medical Center, LP Erroneously Sued As AHMC HEALTHCARE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (NOTICE OF LODGING RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NICOLAI FOONG, M.D.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES); Filed by Nicolai Foong,, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketMotion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by AHMC San GAbriel Valley Medical Center, LP Erroneously Sued As AHMC HEALTHCARE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Nicolai Foong,, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by AHMC San GAbriel Valley Medical Center, LP Erroneously Sued As AHMC HEALTHCARE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Nicolai Foong,, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Nicolai Foong,, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nicolai Foong,, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Siying Yuan, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Baiping Yuan (Plaintiff); Baiping Yuan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Siying Yuan, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Baiping Yuan (Plaintiff); Baiping Yuan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Siying Yuan, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Baiping Yuan (Plaintiff); Baiping Yuan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Siying Yuan, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Baiping Yuan (Plaintiff); Baiping Yuan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Siying Yuan, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Baiping Yuan (Plaintiff); Baiping Yuan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCV33572    Hearing Date: April 16, 2021    Dept: 29

Yuan, et. al.  vs.  AHMC Healthcare, et. al.

TENTATIVE:

1. Defendant’s Two unopposed Motions to Order Compelling Plaintiff, Baiping Yuan, to serve Verified Responses to Demands for Production and Inspection of Documents, Set One are GRANTED.

2. Defendant’s Two unopposed Motions to Order Compelling Plaintiff, Siying Yuan, to serve Verified Responses to Demands for Production and Inspection of Documents, Set One; Special Interrogatories, Set One, are GRANTED.

Moving party to provide notice.

Factual Summary:

This action arises from wrongful death that allegedly occurred on 06/23/18. Plaintiffs allege three causes action: medical negligence-wrongful death, loss of consortium, and negligent infliction of emotional distress. 

On 02/25/20, Defendant filed an Answer and propounded Demand for Production and Inspection of Documents, Set One and Special Interrogatories, Set One on each Plaintiff. Plaintiff did not respond to all of the discovery although Defendant attempted to meet and confer by letter dated 04/27/20 and by e-mail 08/05/20. Exhibit B, C. Declaration of Hilliary Powell, ¶ 4, 5. 

Defendant moves to compel Plaintiffs’ responses to the foregoing discovery. Plaintiffs did not file an opposition. No sanctions were requested. 

Analysis :

Since Plaintiffs have failed to respond to authorized discovery and are therefore ordered to serve verified responses to all written discovery at issue without objection within 20 days. (CCP sections 2030.290 and 2031.300(b).) All objections have been waived given Plaintiffs’ failure to respond. (CCP section 2030.290 and 2031.300(b).)

In addition, since Plaintiffs have failed to respond to the requests for admission, the Defendant’s requests for admission are deemed admitted. (CCP section 2033.280.)

Moving Party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: 19STCV33572    Hearing Date: December 09, 2020    Dept: 29

Yuan v. AHMC Healthcare et al.

Two unopposed Motions by Defendant, Nicolai Foong, M.D., to Compel Responses of Plaintiffs Baiping Yuan and Siyung Yuan, by and through her Guardian ad litem Baiping Yuan, to Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents, are GRANTED.

Plaintiffs are ordered to serve verified responses without objection to Form and Special Interrogatories, and Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents within 30 days of notice of this order. (Code Civil Procedure  § 2030.290(b); §2031.300(b).) Plaintiffs have waived all objections given their failure to respond. (Code Civil Procedure § 2030.290(b); §2031.300(b).)

Moving party is ordered to give notice and to file proof of notice with the court.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where AHMC HEALTHCARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GAMBARDELLA STEVEN CARMINE