This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2023 at 00:04:16 (UTC).

SIXIA OSEGUERA, ET AL. VS GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 SIXIA OSEGUERA, filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3811

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OSEGUERA FRANKLIN

OSEGUERA ALFREDO

OSEGUERA SIXIA

Defendants

GLAUM JANET

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON JARED

Defendant Attorney

ARQUELL IVETTA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/30/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

2/7/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], PI GENERAL ORDER, STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

2/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], PI GENERAL ORDER, STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Request for Dismissal

3/26/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/10/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Demand for Jury Trial

4/23/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

4/23/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/23/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

7/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Sixia Oseguera, et al. on 01/30/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Sixia Oseguera, Franklin Oseguera, and Alfredo Oseguera as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Janet Glaum (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Janet Glaum (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Janet Glaum (Defendant); As to: Sixia Oseguera (Plaintiff); Franklin Oseguera (Plaintiff); Alfredo Oseguera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Sixia Oseguera (Plaintiff); As to: Janet Glaum (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Sixia Oseguera, et al. on 01/30/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Alfredo Oseguera, Franklin Oseguera, and Sixia Oseguera as to Geico Casualty Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], PI General Order, Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sixia Oseguera (Plaintiff); Franklin Oseguera (Plaintiff); Alfredo Oseguera (Plaintiff); As to: Geico Casualty Company (Defendant); Janet Glaum (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sixia Oseguera (Plaintiff); Franklin Oseguera (Plaintiff); Alfredo Oseguera (Plaintiff); As to: Geico Casualty Company (Defendant); Janet Glaum (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sixia Oseguera (Plaintiff); Franklin Oseguera (Plaintiff); Alfredo Oseguera (Plaintiff); As to: Geico Casualty Company (Defendant); Janet Glaum (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kristin S. Escalante in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less