This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2022 at 10:15:19 (UTC).

SIU KEI LUI VS VICTORIA DENIS ZUNIGA

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 SIU KEI LUI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VICTORIA DENIS ZUNIGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0082

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUI SIU KEI

Defendants

ZUNIGA VICTORIA DENIS

HOUSTON TIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

XU YING

Defendant Attorneys

FAIRCHILD DARA

MANDELL BARBARA J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/17/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

12/16/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

12/16/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/6/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/3/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

1/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/14/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/14/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2024
  • Hearing10/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • Hearing05/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • Hearing04/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Tim Houston (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Tim Houston (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SIU KEI LUI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by SIU KEI LUI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by VICTORIA DENIS ZUNIGA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by VICTORIA DENIS ZUNIGA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by VICTORIA DENIS ZUNIGA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by SIU KEI LUI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SIU KEI LUI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SIU KEI LUI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SIU KEI LUI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAIRCHILD DARA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANDELL BARBARA J.