Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:29:29 (UTC).

SIRVART DEIRMENJIAN VS BIJAN ARYA

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 SIRVART DEIRMENJIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BIJAN ARYA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9017

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DEIRMENJIAN SIRVART

Defendants and Respondents

ARYA BIJAN

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SALLE WILLIAM F. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

STANLEY JAMES G. ESQ.

STANLEY JAMES G.ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/6/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANT, BIJAN ARYA'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

9/14/2017: DEFENDANT, BIJAN ARYA'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

9/14/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/30/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

7/19/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

7/19/2017: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SIRVART DEIRMENJIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT, BIJAN ARYA'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BIJAN ARYA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by BIJAN ARYA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by SIRVART DEIRMENJIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SIRVART DEIRMENJIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STANLEY JAMES G. ESQ.