Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2021 at 20:40:15 (UTC).

SINGSON, SYDNEY LEE VS ROSA ESGUERRA, RANDALL JOURELL STA

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 SINGSON, SYDNEY LEE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROSA ESGUERRA, RANDALL JOURELL STA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1302

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SINGSON SYDNEY LEE

Respondent

ROSA ESGUERRA RANDALL JOURELL STA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons

11/16/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

11/16/2020: Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

8/31/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

8/31/2020: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

8/31/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

9/1/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

9/1/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less