This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/10/2019 at 04:37:44 (UTC).

SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. VS GLENN BUILDING SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against GLENN BUILDING SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1137

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT INC.

Defendant

GLENN BUILDING SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINANIAN SERGE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/9/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/7/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/7/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/7/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/7/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/4/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

12/3/2019: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • Hearing02/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sinanian Development, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Sinanian Development, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sinanian Development, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sinanian Development, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sinanian Development, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLENN BUILDING SERVICES INC.[ROE 2] is a litigant

Latest cases where SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SINANIAN SERGE ESQ.