Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2020 at 11:49:40 (UTC).

SIMSON WANG VS LISA PULVER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 SIMSON WANG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LISA PULVER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0334

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANG SIMSON

Defendants

PULVER LISA

STARLIGHT ANESTHESIA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LENSKY ARTHUR L.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/15/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

3/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/2/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/2/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Simson Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Simson Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Simson Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Simson Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Simson Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Simson Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LENSKY ARTHUR