This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2023 at 22:52:38 (UTC).

SIMPSON, LAUREN REAGAN VS FRANZ, PAUL ROBERT

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 SIMPSON, LAUREN REAGAN filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against FRANZ, PAUL ROBERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PELLMAN, AMY M. and KAUFMAN, SHELLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0008

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PELLMAN, AMY M.

KAUFMAN, SHELLEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SIMPSON LAUREN REAGAN

Respondent

FRANZ PAUL ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HALLIN FAHIMEH TAKESH

Respondent Attorney

HANASAB MICHAEL B

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/6/2023: Minute Order

Request - Dismissal

1/6/2023: Request - Dismissal

FL_General Family Law - Request - Dismissal

1/4/2023: FL_General Family Law - Request - Dismissal

Minute Order

11/7/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/12/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 (Appearances)

9/8/2022: Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 (Appearances)

Minute Order

8/30/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010

8/30/2022: Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010

Declaration - Declaration of Laura Teeples (Declarations)

8/29/2022: Declaration - Declaration of Laura Teeples (Declarations)

Declaration - Declaration of Nancy Simpson (Declarations)

8/29/2022: Declaration - Declaration of Nancy Simpson (Declarations)

Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service (Comment)

8/29/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service (Comment)

Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010

8/29/2022: Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010

Declaration - Declaration of Mia Reich-Sjorgen (Declarations)

8/29/2022: Declaration - Declaration of Mia Reich-Sjorgen (Declarations)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

8/26/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Opposition - Opposition

8/26/2022: Opposition - Opposition

Proof of Service - Proof of Personal Service (Comment)

8/16/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Personal Service (Comment)

Notice - Notice of Hague Application (Comment)

8/3/2022: Notice - Notice of Hague Application (Comment)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/06/2023

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Kaufman, Shelley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2023

DocketRequest - Dismissal; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Stipulation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2022

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2022

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2022

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2022

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2022

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
08/29/2022

DocketProof of Service (Proof of Electronic Service (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022

DocketOpposition (Opposition ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022

DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022

DocketProof of Service (Proof of Personal Service (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2022

DocketMemorandum - Points and Authorities (Memorandum - Points and Authorities (Expedite Setting of Hague) (Memos) ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2022

DocketMiscellaneous (Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2022

DocketNotice (Notice of Hague Application (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2022

DocketMiscellaneous (Proposed Writ of Habeas Corpus (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2022

DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2022

DocketPetition - Family Law Other (Petition to Return Minor Child per Hague Abduction Convention (Petitions) ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less