This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2022 at 08:59:53 (UTC).

SIMONE TONDREAU VS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 SIMONE TONDREAU filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8059

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TONDREAU SIMONE

Defendants

CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

ELNALES DENNIS NICOLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAZDANPANAH HAMED L

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2024
  • Hearing10/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • Hearing04/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SIMONE TONDREAU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SIMONE TONDREAU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SIMONE TONDREAU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEMS is a litigant

Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAZDANPANAH HAMED L