This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/28/2021 at 13:07:07 (UTC).

SIMONA SLYVYCH, ET AL. VS ANATOLIY CHIZMAR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 SIMONA SLYVYCH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANATOLIY CHIZMAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are VIRGINIA KEENY, HUEY P. COTTON and JAMES A. KADDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0105

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

VIRGINIA KEENY

HUEY P. COTTON

JAMES A. KADDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SLYVYCH SIMONA

SLYVYCH IVAN

UNGVAR TEAM CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION NOMINAL DEFENDANT

UNGVAR TEAM CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

SIROMAN COFFEE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

UNGVAR TEAM CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION NOMINAL DEFENDANT

VELES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHIZMAR ANATOLIY

VELES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION NOMINAL DEFENDANT.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

VELES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHIZMAR ANATOLIY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MATEVOSYAN ARMAN

GRUZMAN ALEKSANDR

SICILIANO NICHOLAS ARTHUR

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SICILIANO NICHOLAS ARTHUR

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF AMENDED NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APP.; TSC; AND FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

11/18/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF AMENDED NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APP.; TSC; AND FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

Status Report

11/16/2020: Status Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE MSC IN I; STATUS CONFERENCE RE ...)

9/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE MSC IN I; STATUS CONFERENCE RE ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE MSC IN I)

9/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE MSC IN I)

Status Report

8/5/2020: Status Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE MSC IN I)

8/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE MSC IN I)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

8/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

7/6/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

7/10/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Personal Service

2/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/24/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/29/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • Hearing06/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Hearing03/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Hearing03/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling Re Filing Deadline for Cross-Complainants to File First Amended Cross-Complaint); Filed by Anatoliy Chizmar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Status Conference (re Revival of Veles, Inc.) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Status Conference re Revival of Vel...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNotice (Defendant Veles Inc.'s Notice of Active Status with Franchise Tax Board); Filed by VELES INC, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference; Filed by VELES INC, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/29/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Simona Slyvych (Plaintiff); Ivan Slyvych (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Simona Slyvych (Plaintiff); Ivan Slyvych (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Simona Slyvych (Plaintiff); Ivan Slyvych (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Simona Slyvych (Plaintiff); Ivan Slyvych (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SICILIANO NICHOLAS ARTHUR