This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2022 at 19:25:03 (UTC).

SIMON M. DEMCHUK VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 SIMON M DEMCHUK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3316

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEMCHUK SIMON M.

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YANG MICHELLE

Defendant Attorney

BRAR DARSHNIK MEET SINGH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/24/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

12/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

1/3/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • Hearing04/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • Hearing04/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SIMON M. DEMCHUK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SIMON M. DEMCHUK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SIMON M. DEMCHUK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SIMON M. DEMCHUK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SIMON M. DEMCHUK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SIMON M. DEMCHUK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SIMON M. DEMCHUK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SIMON M. DEMCHUK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant