This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 00:42:59 (UTC).

SIMIN MOJALLALI VS FH & HF-TORRANCE I, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 SIMIN MOJALLALI filed an Other lawsuit against FH HF-TORRANCE I, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1615

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOJALLALI SIMIN

Defendants

ANSARY GITI

FAMILY HEALTH AND HOUSING FOUNDATION

FH & HF-TORRANCE I LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

WALKER KATHLEEN M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/12/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 12/20/2021

12/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 12/20/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

12/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Answer

12/17/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

12/17/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY, KATHLEEN WALKER, ESQ. FOR DEFENDANTS

12/17/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY, KATHLEEN WALKER, ESQ. FOR DEFENDANTS

Proof of Service by Mail

12/13/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

11/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Related Case

11/16/2021: Notice of Related Case

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • Hearing08/30/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Hearing02/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docketat 11:27 AM in Department 16; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 12/20/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Trial Attorney, Kathleen Walker, Esq. For Defendants); Filed by FH & HF-Torrance I, LLC (Defendant); Family Health And Housing Foundation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by FH & HF-Torrance I, LLC (Defendant); Family Health And Housing Foundation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FH & HF-Torrance I, LLC (Defendant); Family Health And Housing Foundation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Simin Mojallali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Simin Mojallali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Simin Mojallali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Simin Mojallali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Simin Mojallali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Simin Mojallali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Simin Mojallali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAMILY HEALTH AND HOUSING FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FH & HF-TORRANCE I LLC DBA SUNNYSIDE NURSING CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL