This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2022 at 16:30:39 (UTC).

SIMANTOV "SAM" ESHAGHIAN, ET AL. VS PROVIDENT TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 SIMANTOV SAM ESHAGHIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROVIDENT TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8913

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESHAGHIAN SIMANTOV "SAM"

SIMANTOV "SAM" ESHAGHIAN AS TRUSTEE OF THE ESHAGHIAN FAMILY TRUST

Defendants

PROVIDENT TITLE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

PROVIDENT TITLE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE RICHARD H

Defendant Attorney

FELTEN JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

6/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

7/16/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Answer

7/8/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement - CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/2/2021: Case Management Statement - CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

9/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/31/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:) OF 09/17/2021

9/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:) OF 09/17/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)

9/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • Hearing10/14/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Hearing05/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:) of 09/17/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Simantov "Sam" Eshaghian (Plaintiff); Simantov "Sam" Eshaghian, as trustee of the Eshaghian Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Provident Title Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Simantov "Sam" Eshaghian (Plaintiff); Simantov "Sam" Eshaghian, as trustee of the Eshaghian Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Provident Title Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Simantov "Sam" Eshaghian (Plaintiff); Simantov "Sam" Eshaghian, as trustee of the Eshaghian Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT); Filed by Simantov "Sam" Eshaghian (Plaintiff); Simantov "Sam" Eshaghian, as trustee of the Eshaghian Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Simantov "Sam" Eshaghian (Plaintiff); Simantov "Sam" Eshaghian, as trustee of the Eshaghian Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Simantov "Sam" Eshaghian (Plaintiff); Simantov "Sam" Eshaghian, as trustee of the Eshaghian Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Simantov "Sam" Eshaghian (Plaintiff); Simantov "Sam" Eshaghian, as trustee of the Eshaghian Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Simantov "Sam" Eshaghian (Plaintiff); Simantov "Sam" Eshaghian, as trustee of the Eshaghian Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROVIDENT TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELTEN JENNIFER