This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2021 at 08:41:24 (UTC).

SIMA LMANI VS RALPHS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 SIMA LMANI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RALPHS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1038

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LMANI SIMA

Defendants

KROGER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP 1

RALPHS

THE KROGER CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FOX JAMES E.

MESRIANI RODNEY

Defendant Attorney

LANG LINDSAY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/4/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

6/15/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

7/26/2021: Answer

Association of Attorney

7/26/2021: Association of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2024
  • Hearing05/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • Hearing12/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Hearing11/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Sima lmani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ralphs (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sima lmani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sima lmani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sima lmani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sima lmani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sima lmani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sima lmani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KROGER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP 1 is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOX JAMES E.