This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/08/2021 at 01:33:46 (UTC).

SILVIA ISABEL OCHOA TORRES VS VOLUME DISTRIBUTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 SILVIA ISABEL OCHOA TORRES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against VOLUME DISTRIBUTION, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1207

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCHOA TORRES SILVIA ISABEL

Defendants

ORTEGA VICTOR

VOLUME DISTRIBUTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NALBANDYAN A. JACOB

Defendant Attorney

MOGHADDAMI ALI R.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Order

10/29/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

10/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/9/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

7/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

7/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/21/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

6/22/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/22/2021

6/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/22/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/24/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

6/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/28/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • Hearing12/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Silvia Isabel Ochoa Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Silvia Isabel Ochoa Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Volume Distribution, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 10:46 AM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Silvia Isabel Ochoa Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Silvia Isabel Ochoa Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Silvia Isabel Ochoa Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Silvia Isabel Ochoa Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOGHADDAMI ALI R.