This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2021 at 15:10:18 (UTC).

SILVESTRE VERDIN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ADVENTIST HEALTH WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 SILVESTRE VERDIN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ADVENTIST HEALTH WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7668

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERDIN AN INDIVIDUAL SILVESTRE

Defendants

ADVENTIST HEALTH WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WANG M.D. AN INDIVIDUAL ON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHIE DARREN M

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/4/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2024
  • Hearing10/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • Hearing04/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • Hearing03/29/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SILVESTRE VERDIN, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SILVESTRE VERDIN, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SILVESTRE VERDIN, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH WHITE MEMORIAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHIE DARREN M.