Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2021 at 09:42:09 (UTC).

SILVERMAN, STEFANIE VS SILVERMAN, JEFFREY

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 SILVERMAN, STEFANIE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SILVERMAN, JEFFREY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1772

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SILVERMAN STEFANIE

Respondent

SILVERMAN JEFFREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RUBINSTEIN TODD DAVID

Respondent Attorney

PARMAR RAVI

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure

4/15/2021: Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service - Mail - FL140, FL142, FL150

4/15/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - FL140, FL142, FL150

Declaration - Income and Expense

4/15/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

4/16/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service of Summons

1/14/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1/19/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service - Mail - FL 120

1/19/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - FL 120

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

1/19/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

11/9/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Declaration - Income and Expense

11/9/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

Summons

11/9/2020: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

11/9/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Case Assignment

11/10/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

11/10/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (FL140, FL142, FL150 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (FL 120 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARMAR RAVI