This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 11:35:41 (UTC).

SILVERLINE NEVADA LTD VS. ALLSTATE ENGINEERING

Case Summary

On 01/05/2017 SILVERLINE NEVADA LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALLSTATE ENGINEERING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAURICE A. LEITER and BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8661

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAURICE A. LEITER

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CALIFORNIA FENCE AND SUPPLY

SILVERLINE NEVADA LTD

Defendants

DOES 1-10

ALLSTATE ENGINEERING

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STEPHEN B. GOLDBERG

GOLDBERG STEPHEN B.

Defendant Attorney

HOROWITZ JEFFREY D.

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

9/11/2018: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

12/10/2018: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3/7/2019: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by CALIFORNIA FENCE AND SUPPLY (Legacy Party); SILVERLINE NEVADA LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by SILVERLINE NEVADA LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Acknowldgmt of Satisfaction of Jdg (PARTIAL SATISFACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by SILVERLINE NEVADA LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by SILVERLINE NEVADA LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department A; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) (Motion Set Aside Default/Judgment; Motion Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • at 09:00 am in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Motion Set Aside Default/Judgment - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-05-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2017
  • Answer; Filed by ALLSTATE ENGINEERING (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Answer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by SILVERLINE NEVADA LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by SILVERLINE NEVADA LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less