This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 05:32:57 (UTC).

SILVER, DILLON VS SILVER, RICCI

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 SILVER, DILLON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SILVER, RICCI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCULLY, ELIZABETH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0309

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SCULLY, ELIZABETH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SILVER DILLON

Respondent

SILVER RICCI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SAEI ATOUSA

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

5/16/2023: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Notice - Ruling - Notice - Ruling (Notices)

3/27/2023: Notice - Ruling - Notice - Ruling (Notices)

Notice - Ruling - Notice - Ruling (Notices)

3/27/2023: Notice - Ruling - Notice - Ruling (Notices)

Minute Order

3/16/2023: Minute Order

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

1/12/2023: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Declaration - Declaration (Declarations)

1/11/2023: Declaration - Declaration (Declarations)

RFO/MTN - Withdraw/Be Relieved as Counsel of Record

1/11/2023: RFO/MTN - Withdraw/Be Relieved as Counsel of Record

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

1/11/2023: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

1/11/2023: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

Stipulation and Order

11/21/2022: Stipulation and Order

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

10/17/2022: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

10/17/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

10/17/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service

10/17/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service

Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service)

10/11/2022: Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service)

Proof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition - Proof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition (Amendments)

10/10/2022: Proof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition - Proof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition (Amendments)

Petition - Amended (1st) - Petition - Amended (1st) (Amendments)

10/7/2022: Petition - Amended (1st) - Petition - Amended (1st) (Amendments)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketNotice - Ruling (Notice - Ruling (Notices) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketNotice - Ruling (Notice - Ruling (Notices) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 27, Scully, Elizabeth, Presiding; RFO - Withdraw/Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition (Proof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition (Amendments) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketPetition - Amended (1st) (Petition - Amended (1st) (Amendments) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketSummons - Amended (Summons - Amended (Amendments) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - $435.00 (Petitions) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons (Summons) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less