This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 00:13:49 (UTC).

SILVER CREEK INDUSTRIES INC VS LIGHTHOUSE BROOKS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/02/2017 SILVER CREEK INDUSTRIES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LIGHTHOUSE BROOKS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9845

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SILVER CREEK INDUSTRIES INC

Respondents and Defendants

LIGHTHOUSE BROOKS LLC

FIRST CENTURY BANK N.A.

DOES 1 TO 100

DOES 1-100

PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHAUER ROBERT F. ESQ.

TRAN LINH T. (IN HOUSE COUNSEL)

TRAN LINH T. IN HOUSE COUNSEL

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/10/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

4/16/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE STATUS CONFERENCE

4/17/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE STATUS CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/12/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

5/2/2017: SUMMONS

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; MATERIALS FURNISHED; OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT; FORECLOSURE OF MECHANIC'S LIEN; RECOVERY ON CONTRACTOR'S STATE LICENSE BOND; RECOVERY ON BONDED STOP NOTICE

5/2/2017: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; MATERIALS FURNISHED; OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT; FORECLOSURE OF MECHANIC'S LIEN; RECOVERY ON CONTRACTOR'S STATE LICENSE BOND; RECOVERY ON BONDED STOP NOTICE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/22/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF SERVICE

5/31/2017: DECLARATION OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/31/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF SERVICE

5/31/2017: DECLARATION OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/5/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

8/22/2017: WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

8/23/2017: VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

STIPULATION & ORDER PERMITTING FILING OF VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DISMISSAL OF PARTIES AND CLAIMS; STAY OF ACTION

8/23/2017: STIPULATION & ORDER PERMITTING FILING OF VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DISMISSAL OF PARTIES AND CLAIMS; STAY OF ACTION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Silver Creek Industries, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Silver Creek Industries, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48; Status Conference (Status Conference; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Proceedings Stayed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Silver Creek Industries, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • STIPULATION & ORDER PERMITTING FILING OF VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DISMISSAL OF PARTIES AND CLAIMS; STAY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2017
  • DECLARATION OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Silver Creek Industries, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Silver Creek Industries, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; MATERIALS FURNISHED; OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT; FORECLOSURE OF MECHANIC'S LIEN; RECOVERY ON CONTRACTOR'S STATE LICENSE BOND; RECOVERY ON BONDED STOP NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Silver Creek Industries, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST CENTURY BANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where SILVER CREEK INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LIGHTHOUSE BROOKS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant