This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2021 at 07:14:02 (UTC).

SILLA AMERICA INC VS DUCKSUNG INC

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 SILLA AMERICA INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DUCKSUNG INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS and RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5779

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SILLA AMERICA INC.

Defendants and Respondents

DUCKSUNG INC.

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ECOFF CAMPAIN & TILLES LLP

ECOFF LAWRENCE CRAIG

Defendant Attorney

BIGGINS DOUGLAS CHADWICK

 

Court Documents

Motion for Attorney Fees

3/18/2019: Motion for Attorney Fees

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

7/22/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)

7/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not ...)

1/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/18/2019 and Ruling

1/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/18/2019 and Ruling

Order - Order on submitted matter

1/18/2019: Order - Order on submitted matter

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

2/5/2019: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

11/5/2018: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Request for Judicial Notice

11/7/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition - Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Strike Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 436; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof

12/24/2018: Opposition - Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Strike Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 436; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof

Declaration - Declaration RE OSC

12/31/2018: Declaration - Declaration RE OSC

Reply - Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Strike

12/31/2018: Reply - Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Strike

Notice of Continuance - Notice of Continued Case Management Conference; and Notice of Order to Show Case Re Sanctions for Defense Counsel's Failure to Appear at Case Management Conference and Failure

11/15/2018: Notice of Continuance - Notice of Continued Case Management Conference; and Notice of Order to Show Case Re Sanctions for Defense Counsel's Failure to Appear at Case Management Conference and Failure

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/1/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

7/26/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

7/26/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

SUMMONS -

7/26/2018: SUMMONS -

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((16-24 hours)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Silla America, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Silla America, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketOpposition (to Motion for Attorney's Fees); Filed by Silla America, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketMotion for Attorney Fees; Filed by Ducksung, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Ducksung, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Docketat 2:50 PM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by Ducksung, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Silla America, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Silla America, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Silla America, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Silla America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DUCKSUNG INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIGGINS DOUGLAS CHAD