This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 15:35:52 (UTC).

SIGRID HAZEL SOTO, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS NUNE BADALYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 SIGRID HAZEL SOTO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NUNE BADALYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5858

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MANRIQUE AN INDIVIDUAL JORGE

SOTO AN INDIVIDUAL SIGRID HAZEL

Defendants

BADALYAN AN INDIVIDUAL NUNE

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SPECIALTY HEALHCARE PROPERTIES LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRADKIN IGOR ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/29/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2024
  • Hearing09/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • Hearing03/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • Hearing03/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SIGRID HAZEL SOTO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); JORGE MANRIQUE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SIGRID HAZEL SOTO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); JORGE MANRIQUE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SIGRID HAZEL SOTO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); JORGE MANRIQUE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECIALY HEALTHCARE PROPERTIES LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRADKIN IGOR