This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2020 at 01:29:49 (UTC).

SIERRA HOLT VS ROBERT RAMIREZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/28/2018 SIERRA HOLT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERT RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5667

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HOLT SIERRA

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

RANDLE SAMANTHA

DOES 1-99

RAMIREZ ROBERT

PRADO SARA

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Defendant

RAMIREZ ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JOYCE STEPHEN M. ESQ.

JOYCE STEPHEN MICHAEL ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CHAVEZ LEGAL GROUP

GREER R. DENYSE

LERNER MAUREEN

PORVIN TERRY ESQ.

PLATT JESSICA B. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 07/07/2020

7/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 07/07/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

7/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 07/15/2020

7/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 07/15/2020

Motion for Attorney Fees

2/19/2020: Motion for Attorney Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY CHANGE

1/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY CHANGE

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

11/27/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, TRIAL DATE AND ALL DISCOVERY DATESINCLUDING EXPERT DISCOVERY

12/2/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, TRIAL DATE AND ALL DISCOVERY DATESINCLUDING EXPERT DISCOVERY

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/18/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

DEFENDANT ROBERT RAMIREZ'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

7/30/2018: DEFENDANT ROBERT RAMIREZ'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/12/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Cross-Complaint

12/12/2018: Cross-Complaint

Answer

12/12/2018: Answer

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

6/28/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

8/14/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

8/14/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

SUMMONS -

2/28/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

2/28/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • Hearing12/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docketat 2:57 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Settlement) of 07/15/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Sierra Holt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of 07/07/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Robert Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sierra Holt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sierra Holt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695667    Hearing Date: March 13, 2020    Dept: 29

Holt v. Ramirez, et al.

Good cause having been shown, the Court GRANTS Defendant’s motion to continue trial. The Court advances and vacates the current final status conference and trial dates, and sets the following dates:

Final status conference: July 20, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Department 29, Spring Street Courthouse

Trial: August 3, 2020, at 8:30 a.m. Department 29, Spring Street Courthouse

Discovery and motion cut off dates are to be determined based on the new trial date.

The trial date is firm. The parties are ordered to inform their witnesses of the new date immediately. The Court has granted this continuance to the date selected by the parties. The Court presumes that the date has been cleared with the parties, counsel and experts, and grants the continuance in reliance on the implicit representation that the parties, counsel and experts will be available on the date of trial and day-to-day thereafter for the length of the trial plus a five-day trailing period. No further continuances should be expected.

The parties must diligently prepare for trial, including the completion of expert discovery, even if the parties intend to participate in mediation and are hopeful the case will settle.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.