This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 16:43:52 (UTC).

SIERRA GAGAU VS COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 SIERRA GAGAU filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6339

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAGAU SIERRA

Defendants

CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH

DIGNITY COMMUNITY CARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEAGER KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2024
  • Hearing09/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • Hearing03/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sierra Gagau (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sierra Gagau (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases where DIGNITY COMMUNITY CARE is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEAGER KENNETH