This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2022 at 00:32:43 (UTC).

SIEREN PHOTOGRAPHY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS TINA HARE

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 SIEREN PHOTOGRAPHY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TINA HARE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4546

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIEREN PHOTOGRAPHY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

HARE TINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLUM HOWARD SCOTT

BLUM HOWARD S

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/7/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Case Management Statement

3/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

5/5/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SIEREN PHOTOGRAPHY, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by SIEREN PHOTOGRAPHY, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SIEREN PHOTOGRAPHY, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SIEREN PHOTOGRAPHY, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SIEREN PHOTOGRAPHY, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SIEREN PHOTOGRAPHY, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLUM HOWARD S.