Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2021 at 12:11:45 (UTC).

SIEDAH COOK, ET AL. VS 1212 WEST L.P., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 SIEDAH COOK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 1212 WEST L P . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4928

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOK SIEDAH

Defendants

1212 WEST L.P.

LONG BEACH AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIELSEN TANNER R.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/22/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR HEAVEN

4/29/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR HEAVEN

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/20/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • Hearing07/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Hearing07/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Siedah Cook (Plaintiff); Heaven Cook (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Heaven); Filed by Siedah Cook (Plaintiff); Heaven Cook (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Siedah Cook (Plaintiff); Heaven Cook (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Siedah Cook (Plaintiff); Heaven Cook (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NIELSEN TANNER