This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2021 at 04:11:55 (UTC).

SIDA OUM ET AL VS MICAELA LILIANA RAMOS ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/16/2017 SIDA OUM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICAELA LILIANA RAMOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS J. LANDIN, CHRISTOPHER K. LUI, STEPHEN M. MOLONEY and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9590

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DENNIS J. LANDIN

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

STEPHEN M. MOLONEY

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

NGUYEN HONG MA THI

CIZMIC SOFIJA TRIFUNOVIC

LE RE MAU

OUM SIDA

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

RAMOS MICAELA LILIANA

VAHHAJI MOHAMMED

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Respondent, Defendant and Cross Defendant

VAHHAJI MOHAMMED

Minors

ATH KATELYN

ATH PESETH

Guardian Ad Litem, Petitioner and Plaintiff

OUM SIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Plaintiff and Minor Attorneys

SHEA ADAM K.

TORKZADEH REZA

GUNNING J PATRICK KRAVETZ

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

WOLLER JOHN S.

LEONARD EDWARD RICHARD

WOLLER JOHN SCOTT

LEONARD EDWARD R.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

WOLLER JOHN SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Order Approving Compromise Of Disputed Claim or pe -

8/22/2018: Order Approving Compromise Of Disputed Claim or pe -

Order Approving Compromise Of Disputed Claim or pe -

8/22/2018: Order Approving Compromise Of Disputed Claim or pe -

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

6/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

Notice - NOTICE OF OSC RE SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO APPEAR

6/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF OSC RE SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO APPEAR

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PATRICK GUNNING RE: OSC AND PROOF OF FUNDING

6/14/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PATRICK GUNNING RE: OSC AND PROOF OF FUNDING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

5/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 05/25/2021

5/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 05/25/2021

Notice of Ruling

11/20/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

4/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

10/23/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

10/23/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE; HEARING ON...)

11/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE; HEARING ON...)

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM 384

10/23/2020: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM 384

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM 266

10/23/2020: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM 266

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/19/2020

6/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/19/2020

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5

2/14/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1

2/14/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Plaintiff's Counsel Should not be Sanctioned $250.00 for Their Failure to Appear) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF PATRICK GUNNING RE: OSC AND PROOF OF FUNDING); Filed by Katelyn Ath (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (of OSC re Sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to Appear); Filed by Katelyn Ath (Plaintiff); Peseth Ath (Plaintiff); Sofija Trifunovic Cizmic (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 05/25/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
182 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. SURVIVAL ACTION, ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Sida Oum (Plaintiff); Peseth Ath (Plaintiff); Katelyn Ath (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Sida Oum (Plaintiff); Peseth Ath (Plaintiff); Katelyn Ath (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Sida Oum (Plaintiff); Peseth Ath (Plaintiff); Katelyn Ath (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Sida Oum (Plaintiff); Peseth Ath (Plaintiff); Katelyn Ath (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint ( (1st)); Filed by Katelyn Ath (Plaintiff); Peseth Ath (Plaintiff); Sofija Trifunovic Cizmic (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF HONG MA THI NGUYEN, AS THE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF RICHARD MAU LE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 377.32 AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF RE MAU LE, AS THE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF THE ESTATE OF RICHARD MAULE PURSUANT TO C.C.P.377.32 AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. SURVIVAL ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sida Oum (Plaintiff); Re Mau Le (Plaintiff); Hong Ma Thi Nguyen (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9590    Hearing Date: November 16, 2020    Dept: 28

Petition to Approve Minor’s Compromise (x2)

Having considered the petitioning papers, the Court rules as follows.  No opposing papers were filed.

BACKGROUND

On October 16, 2017, Plaintiffs Sida Oum, Peseth Ath, Katelynn Ath, Re Mau Le, Hong Ma Thi Nguyen, and Sofija Trifunovic Cizmic filed a complaint against Defendants Micaela Liliana Ramos and Mohammed Vahhaji.  The plaintiffs allege negligence and survival action in the complaint arising from a fatal multi-vehicle collision that occurred on June 17, 2016.

On December 27, 2017, the plaintiffs filed a first amended complaint.

On January 22, 2018, the plaintiffs filed a second amended complaint.

On September 14, 2018, the plaintiffs filed a third amended complaint.

On October 23, 2020, Petitioner Moloney Oum filed petitions to approve compromises of pending actions for Claimants Peseth Ath and Katelynn Ath.

An Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) is set for April 8, 2021.

PARTY’S REQUESTS

Petitioner Moloney Oum (“Petitioner”) asks the Court to grant a petitions to approve compromises of pending for Claimants Peseth Ath and Katelynn Ath (collectively “Claimants”).

LEGAL STANDARD

Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952(a), Petitioner and Claimants are required to attend the hearing on the petition.  However, the Court finds that Petitioner’s and Claimants attendance are not required due to Claimants age and the settlement amount.

DISCUSSION

The Court finds the petitions are properly approved.

CONCLUSION

The petitions are therefore APPROVED.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Petitioner is ordered to file the proof of service of this ruling with the Court within five days.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLLER JOHN S.