This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/29/2022 at 10:16:35 (UTC).

SIAVASH ALIKHANLOU VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 SIAVASH ALIKHANLOU filed an Other lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1198

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALIKHANLOU SIAVASH

Respondent

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BECKER TODD BENJAMIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

4/4/2022: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CINDY PADILLA IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER SIAVASH ALIKHANLOUS PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM GOVERNMENT CLAIM FILING REQUIREMENTS

4/1/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CINDY PADILLA IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER SIAVASH ALIKHANLOUS PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM GOVERNMENT CLAIM FILING REQUIREMENTS

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN E. SHEAR IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER SIAVASH ALIKHANLOUS PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM GOVERNMENT CLAIM FILING REQUIREMENTS

4/1/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN E. SHEAR IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER SIAVASH ALIKHANLOUS PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM GOVERNMENT CLAIM FILING REQUIREMENTS

Petition - PETITION PETITIONER SIAVASH ALIKHANLOUS VERIFIED PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM GOVERNMENT CLAIM FILING REQUIREMENTS

4/1/2022: Petition - PETITION PETITIONER SIAVASH ALIKHANLOUS VERIFIED PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM GOVERNMENT CLAIM FILING REQUIREMENTS

Notice - NOTICE PETITIONER SIAVASH ALIKHANLOUS NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM GOVERNMENT CLAIM FILING REQUIREMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

4/1/2022: Notice - NOTICE PETITIONER SIAVASH ALIKHANLOUS NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM GOVERNMENT CLAIM FILING REQUIREMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KIANA KU IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER SIAVASH ALIKHANLOUS PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM GOVERNMENT CLAIM FILING REQUIREMENTS

4/1/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KIANA KU IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER SIAVASH ALIKHANLOUS PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM GOVERNMENT CLAIM FILING REQUIREMENTS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

4/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • Hearing05/31/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 85 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Siavash Alikhanlou (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Siavash Alikhanlou (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice (PETITIONER SIAVASH ALIKHANLOUS NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM GOVERNMENT CLAIM FILING REQUIREMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES); Filed by Siavash Alikhanlou (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF CINDY PADILLA IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER SIAVASH ALIKHANLOUS PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM GOVERNMENT CLAIM FILING REQUIREMENTS); Filed by Siavash Alikhanlou (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF BRIAN E. SHEAR IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER SIAVASH ALIKHANLOUS PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM GOVERNMENT CLAIM FILING REQUIREMENTS); Filed by Siavash Alikhanlou (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketPetition (PETITIONER SIAVASH ALIKHANLOUS VERIFIED PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM GOVERNMENT CLAIM FILING REQUIREMENTS); Filed by Siavash Alikhanlou (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF KIANA KU IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER SIAVASH ALIKHANLOUS PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM GOVERNMENT CLAIM FILING REQUIREMENTS); Filed by Siavash Alikhanlou (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECKER TODD BENJAMIN