This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 08:22:50 (UTC).

SIANDRA PALACIO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS PRIORITY ONE AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 SIANDRA PALACIO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PRIORITY ONE AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6954

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALACIO AN INDIVIDUAL SIANDRA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PRIORITY ONE AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PRIORITY ONE AIR CONDITIONING PLUMBING & HEATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PRIORITY ONE HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PRIORITY ONE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RUDAS III AN INDIVIDUAL STEFAN

PRIORITY ONE AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING INC.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANGOLI SHAWN L.

Defendant Attorney

YOUNG SARA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/27/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

2/14/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

2/14/2022: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/14/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

2/14/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/11/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

1/11/2022: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2024
  • Hearing12/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • Hearing06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • Hearing06/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by PRIORITY ONE AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PRIORITY ONE AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by PRIORITY ONE AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by PRIORITY ONE AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PRIORITY ONE AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SIANDRA PALACIO, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SIANDRA PALACIO, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SIANDRA PALACIO, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SIANDRA PALACIO, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SIANDRA PALACIO, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SIANDRA PALACIO, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOUNG SARA