This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 01:44:49 (UTC).

SIAMAK TASH VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 SIAMAK TASH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3619

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TASH SIAMAK

Defendants

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NICK ALEXANDER IMPORTS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOHEN ISAAC

Defendant Attorney

LUU BETTY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/29/2021

3/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/29/2021

Case Management Statement

11/6/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Settlement

11/12/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

11/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

9/4/2020: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/22/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SIAMAK TASH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by SIAMAK TASH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); NICK ALEXANDER IMPORTS, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SIAMAK TASH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SIAMAK TASH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SIAMAK TASH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NICK ALEXANDER IMPORTS A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant