This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2022 at 04:54:23 (UTC).

SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION VS. JAZMINE BRITTANY TREVINO

Case Summary

On 01/17/2018 SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAZMINE BRITTANY TREVINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN F. GASDIA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6857

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN F. GASDIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHAWNAN

SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION A DBA SHAWNAN

Defendant

TREVINO JAZMINE BRITTANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEAUMONT NANETTE MARIE

Defendant Attorney

WALSH DANIEL C

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

12/23/2021: Writ - Return

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

4/16/2021: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

4/16/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Writ - Return

6/18/2020: Writ - Return

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL MINUTE ORDER 05/29/2020

6/18/2020: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL MINUTE ORDER 05/29/2020

Writ - Return - WRIT - RETURN PARTIALLY SATISFIED

4/28/2020: Writ - Return - WRIT - RETURN PARTIALLY SATISFIED

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (ORANGE)

12/16/2019: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (ORANGE)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

11/22/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

10/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

10/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RO CONTINUE DEFENDANT, JAZMINE BRITTANY TREVINO'S OCTOBER 21,2019, JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION

10/18/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RO CONTINUE DEFENDANT, JAZMINE BRITTANY TREVINO'S OCTOBER 21,2019, JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION

Proof of Personal Service

10/10/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

8/22/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

7/22/2019: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

7/22/2019: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

7/19/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

7/18/2019: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATON OF DEF. J...)

1/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATON OF DEF. J...)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketWrit - Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION, a (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION, a (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL (Minute order 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return (partially satisfied)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Orange)); Filed by SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION, a (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION, a (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JAZMINE BRITTANY TREVINO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JAZMINE BRITTANY TREVINO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by SHAWNAN (Legacy Party); SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION, a (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by SHAWNAN (Legacy Party); SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION, a (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION, a (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by SHAWNAN (Legacy Party); SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION, a (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less